THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:35:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 102
480 Huronia Road
Toronto Ontario L4N 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 792-0933
Fax: (705) 792-0933
Address: 1-17150 Yonge St
Newmarket ON L3Y 8V3
Phone: +1 877-464-9675
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 220 Duncan Mill Rd
North York Family Medicine Centre
#201
North York ON M3B 3J5
Phone: 6473285567
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Aug 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 102
480 Huronia Road
Toronto Ontario L4N 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 792-0933
Fax: (705) 792-0933
Address: 1-17150 Yonge St
Newmarket ON L3Y 8V3
Phone: +1 877-464-9675
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 220 Duncan Mill Rd
North York Family Medicine Centre
#201
North York ON M3B 3J5
Phone: 6473285567
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Aug 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARRY NOAH PAKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAKES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARRY NOAH PAKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAKES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001