THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:21:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-215 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519472-93333
Fax: 519-286-0277

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. McNaught Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Dec 2023

Corporation Name: John McNaught Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Aug 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-215 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519472-93333
Fax: 519-286-0277

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. McNaught Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Dec 2023

Corporation Name: John McNaught Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Aug 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN JAMES MCNAUGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAUGHT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN JAMES MCNAUGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAUGHT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001