THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:25:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: Pringle, Nancy Elizabeth (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Pringle, Nancy-Shira Elizabeth (Used Until: 01 Jul 2009) Pringle, Nancy Elizabeth (Used Until: 01 Sep 2003)
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AMERICAN SIGN LANGUAGE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Welland Hospital
3rd Street
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Nov 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Aug 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

General Information

Former Name: Pringle, Nancy Elizabeth (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Pringle, Nancy-Shira Elizabeth (Used Until: 01 Jul 2009) Pringle, Nancy Elizabeth (Used Until: 01 Sep 2003)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AMERICAN SIGN LANGUAGE
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Welland Hospital
3rd Street
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Nov 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Aug 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NANCY-SHIRA ELIZABETH BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NANCY-SHIRA ELIZABETH BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001