THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:12:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vaughan Sleep Clinic
200 Windflower Gate
Unit AA5
Woodbridge ON L4L 9L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-856-1300
Fax: 905-856-0900
Address: 197 Third St
Cobourg ON K9A 3L5
Phone: 9053731227
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 301-845 Wilson Avenue
Appleton Sleep Clinic
North York Ontario M3K 1E6
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 Edinbourough St.
Windsor, ON
Windsor Ontario N8X 3C3
Phone: (519) 258-0585
Fax: 519-258-6304
Address: 200-200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON L4L 9L3
Phone: 9058561300
Fax: 9058560900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 05 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Celeste J. Thirlwell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Thirlwell (CPSO#: 76629 )
Business Address: 200 Windflower Gate
Vaughan Ontario L4L 9K8
9053731227
Business Address: 197 3rd Street
Cobourg Ontario K9A 3L5
9053731227
Business Address: 100 - 55 Edingborough Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 3C3
(519) 258-0585
Business Address: 301 - 295 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S2
(416) 603-9531
Business Address: 2352 Yonge Street
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E6
(416) 840-5991

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vaughan Sleep Clinic
200 Windflower Gate
Unit AA5
Woodbridge ON L4L 9L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-856-1300
Fax: 905-856-0900
Address: 197 Third St
Cobourg ON K9A 3L5
Phone: 9053731227
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 301-845 Wilson Avenue
Appleton Sleep Clinic
North York Ontario M3K 1E6
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 Edinbourough St.
Windsor, ON
Windsor Ontario N8X 3C3
Phone: (519) 258-0585
Fax: 519-258-6304
Address: 200-200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON L4L 9L3
Phone: 9058561300
Fax: 9058560900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 05 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Celeste J. Thirlwell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Thirlwell (CPSO#: 76629 )
Business Address: 200 Windflower Gate
Vaughan Ontario L4L 9K8
9053731227
Business Address: 197 3rd Street
Cobourg Ontario K9A 3L5
9053731227
Business Address: 100 - 55 Edingborough Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 3C3
(519) 258-0585
Business Address: 301 - 295 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S2
(416) 603-9531
Business Address: 2352 Yonge Street
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E6
(416) 840-5991

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
05 Nov 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 05 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)

As from 11:59 p.m., November 5, 2021, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Celeste Jean Thirlwell :

Practice Restriction
(1) Dr. Thirlwell shall not provide medical exemptions in relation to vaccines for COVID-19;
(2) Dr. Thirlwell shall not provide medical exemptions in relation to mask requirements for COVID-19;
(3) Dr. Thirlwell shall not provide medical exemptions in relation to testing for COVID-19.
Posting a Sign and Translations
(4) Dr. Thirlwell shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not she is physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out at Schedule “A.” If providing care in a virtual setting, Dr. Thirlwell shall display the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. If the patient encounter is by telephone, Dr. Thirlwell shall read the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: “Dr. Thirlwell must not provide medical exemptions in relation to COVID-19 vaccines, mask requirements or testing. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

(5) Dr. Thirlwell shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in which she provides services, of the sign described in (4) above, in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of her Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form attached hereto as Schedule “A”.
(6) Dr. Thirlwell shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (5) above to the College within 30 days of the date of this Order;
(7) The College may accept an alternative arrangement with respect to signage in a hospital setting, in its sole discretion.
Notification of Practice Locations
(8) Dr. Thirlwell shall inform the College of each and every location at which she practices including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s), office(s) and virtual care setting(s) in any jurisdiction (collectively the “Practice Location(s)”), within five (5) days of this Order. Going forward, she shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at or accepting patients from that location.
Monitoring
(9) Dr. Thirlwell shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, provide to the College her irrevocable consent in the form attached at Schedule “B” for the College to make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”), to monitor her compliance with the terms of this Order.
(10) Dr. Thirlwell shall maintain a log of all professional encounters with patients, including both in-person encounters and encounters in a virtual setting, in the form attached at Schedule “C” (“Patient Log”). Dr. Thirlwell shall include in the Patient Log the name of each patient with whom she has a professional encounter and the date of the encounter; the patient’s date of birth; the reason for the visit; and the type of visit (i.e., telemedicine or in-person).
(11) Dr. Thirlwell shall provide a copy of the Patient Log to the College every two (2) weeks, or at any other time as requested by the College.
(12) Dr. Thirlwell shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of her Practice Locations and to inspections of patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor Dr. Thirlwell’s compliance with the terms of this Order.
(13) Dr. Thirlwell shall consent to the College providing the Order to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location where she practices or has privileges (“Chief(s) of Staff”), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to this Order and/or any information arising from the monitoring of her compliance with this Order.

(2 of 2)
As from October 16, 2019, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Celeste Jean Thirlwell,
in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Thirlwell has given to the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")
of
DR. CELESTE JEAN THIRLWELL
("Dr. Thirlwell")
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
the College;

"NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
System
implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public.

(2) I, Dr. Thirlwell, certificate of registration number 76629, am a member
of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that the College conducted investigations
bearing File
Numbers 7215886 and 1102304 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my sleep medicine
practice.

(4) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that I am entering into two Undertakings on
this date and that, if both Undertakings as signed by me are accepted by
the ICR Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
Undertaking, effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the
ICR Committee ("Effective Date").

(6) Resignation of Prescribing Privileges - Narcotics and Narcotic
Preparations

(a) I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake that I will not issue new prescriptions
or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the
following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act,
S.C., 1996, c. 19); and

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control
Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached
hereto as Appendix "A"; and links to the current regulatory
lists are attached hereto as Appendix "B")

and as amended from time to time.

(b) I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake that I will return any supplies of the
substances referred to in section (a) above that are presently in
my possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure
manner, as stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12,
"Prescribing Drugs."

(7) Change of Scope

(a) I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake that, in the event that I intend to
resume prescribing Narcotic Drugs or Narcotic Preparations in the
future, I will notify the College and comply with the process set
out in the College's Policy on Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope
of Practice and/or Re-Entering Practice.

(8) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
(collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward,
I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
that location.

(b) I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake that I will submit to, and not
interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Thirlwell, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
respectively.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(9) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
right to do so.

(12) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that the College will provide this
Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
of Staff").

(13) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee of the College.

(14) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(15) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that, during the time period that
this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
Thirlwell engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
incompetent in her sleep medicine practice. As a result of
the investigation:

Dr. Thirwell must not issue new prescriptions or renew
existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following
substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act,
S.C., 1996, c. 19); and

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control
Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19).

D. CONSENT

(16) I, Dr. Thirlwell, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.




VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)

As from 11:59 p.m., November 5, 2021, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Celeste Jean Thirlwell :

Practice Restriction
(1) Dr. Thirlwell shall not provide medical exemptions in relation to vaccines for COVID-19;
(2) Dr. Thirlwell shall not provide medical exemptions in relation to mask requirements for COVID-19;
(3) Dr. Thirlwell shall not provide medical exemptions in relation to testing for COVID-19.
Posting a Sign and Translations
(4) Dr. Thirlwell shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not she is physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out at Schedule “A.” If providing care in a virtual setting, Dr. Thirlwell shall display the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. If the patient encounter is by telephone, Dr. Thirlwell shall read the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: “Dr. Thirlwell must not provide medical exemptions in relation to COVID-19 vaccines, mask requirements or testing. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

(5) Dr. Thirlwell shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in which she provides services, of the sign described in (4) above, in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of her Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form attached hereto as Schedule “A”.
(6) Dr. Thirlwell shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (5) above to the College within 30 days of the date of this Order;
(7) The College may accept an alternative arrangement with respect to signage in a hospital setting, in its sole discretion.
Notification of Practice Locations
(8) Dr. Thirlwell shall inform the College of each and every location at which she practices including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s), office(s) and virtual care setting(s) in any jurisdiction (collectively the “Practice Location(s)”), within five (5) days of this Order. Going forward, she shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at or accepting patients from that location.
Monitoring
(9) Dr. Thirlwell shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, provide to the College her irrevocable consent in the form attached at Schedule “B” for the College to make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”), to monitor her compliance with the terms of this Order.
(10) Dr. Thirlwell shall maintain a log of all professional encounters with patients, including both in-person encounters and encounters in a virtual setting, in the form attached at Schedule “C” (“Patient Log”). Dr. Thirlwell shall include in the Patient Log the name of each patient with whom she has a professional encounter and the date of the encounter; the patient’s date of birth; the reason for the visit; and the type of visit (i.e., telemedicine or in-person).
(11) Dr. Thirlwell shall provide a copy of the Patient Log to the College every two (2) weeks, or at any other time as requested by the College.
(12) Dr. Thirlwell shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of her Practice Locations and to inspections of patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor Dr. Thirlwell’s compliance with the terms of this Order.
(13) Dr. Thirlwell shall consent to the College providing the Order to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location where she practices or has privileges (“Chief(s) of Staff”), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to this Order and/or any information arising from the monitoring of her compliance with this Order.

(2 of 2)
As from October 16, 2019, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Celeste Jean Thirlwell,
in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Thirlwell has given to the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")
of
DR. CELESTE JEAN THIRLWELL
("Dr. Thirlwell")
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
the College;

"NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
System
implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public.

(2) I, Dr. Thirlwell, certificate of registration number 76629, am a member
of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that the College conducted investigations
bearing File
Numbers 7215886 and 1102304 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my sleep medicine
practice.

(4) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that I am entering into two Undertakings on
this date and that, if both Undertakings as signed by me are accepted by
the ICR Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
Undertaking, effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the
ICR Committee ("Effective Date").

(6) Resignation of Prescribing Privileges - Narcotics and Narcotic
Preparations

(a) I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake that I will not issue new prescriptions
or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the
following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act,
S.C., 1996, c. 19); and

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control
Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached
hereto as Appendix "A"; and links to the current regulatory
lists are attached hereto as Appendix "B")

and as amended from time to time.

(b) I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake that I will return any supplies of the
substances referred to in section (a) above that are presently in
my possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure
manner, as stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12,
"Prescribing Drugs."

(7) Change of Scope

(a) I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake that, in the event that I intend to
resume prescribing Narcotic Drugs or Narcotic Preparations in the
future, I will notify the College and comply with the process set
out in the College's Policy on Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope
of Practice and/or Re-Entering Practice.

(8) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
(collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward,
I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
that location.

(b) I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake that I will submit to, and not
interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Thirlwell, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
respectively.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(9) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
right to do so.

(12) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that the College will provide this
Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
of Staff").

(13) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee of the College.

(14) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(15) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that, during the time period that
this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
Thirlwell engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
incompetent in her sleep medicine practice. As a result of
the investigation:

Dr. Thirwell must not issue new prescriptions or renew
existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following
substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act,
S.C., 1996, c. 19); and

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control
Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19).

D. CONSENT

(16) I, Dr. Thirlwell, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.




Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Referral or Application: 14 Sep 2023
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Celeste Jean Thirlwell’s professional misconduct and incompetence have been referred to the Discipline Tribunal of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Thirlwell is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in her care of patients, whose identities have been disclosed under separate cover. It is also alleged that Dr. Thirlwell engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by inappropriately providing and inappropriately billing for medical exemptions for vaccination, masking and testing requirements arising out of the COVID-19 pandemic. It is further alleged that Dr. Thirlwell engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or failed to respond appropriately or within a reasonable period of time to a written inquiry from the College, by, commencing in approximately October 2021, failing to co-operate with the College’s investigation, including by failing to provide information, records and documents requested by College staff.
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (4)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 13 Jul 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 16 Oct 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Celeste Jean Thirlwell to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 16, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Thirlwell engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her sleep medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Thirwell must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); and

Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19). 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Oct 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Oct 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Referral or Application: 14 Sep 2023
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Celeste Jean Thirlwell’s professional misconduct and incompetence have been referred to the Discipline Tribunal of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Thirlwell is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in her care of patients, whose identities have been disclosed under separate cover. It is also alleged that Dr. Thirlwell engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by inappropriately providing and inappropriately billing for medical exemptions for vaccination, masking and testing requirements arising out of the COVID-19 pandemic. It is further alleged that Dr. Thirlwell engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or failed to respond appropriately or within a reasonable period of time to a written inquiry from the College, by, commencing in approximately October 2021, failing to co-operate with the College’s investigation, including by failing to provide information, records and documents requested by College staff.
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (4)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 13 Jul 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 16 Oct 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Celeste Jean Thirlwell to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 16, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Thirlwell engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her sleep medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Thirwell must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); and

Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19). 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Oct 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Oct 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee. Effective: 05 Nov 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 01 Nov 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 May 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001