THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:10:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Campbell Dr
Uxbridge site, Oak Valley Health
Uxbridge ON L9P 1R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058529771
Fax: 9058622006
Address: PO Box 664
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
Moose Factory ON P0L 1W0
Phone: 7058584544
Extension: 2237
Fax: 7056584917
Address: 4 Campbell Drive
(locum/ in transition)
Uxbridge Ontario L9P 1S4
Phone: (905) 852-9771
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 406 Lambert St
Whitehorse Medical Services Ltd
Whitehorse YT Y1A 1Z7
Phone: 8673936600
Fax: 8673936601

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Attawapiskat Site Attawapiskat
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site Moosonee
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Fort Albany Site Fort Albany
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Attawapiskat Site
LOCATION: Attawapiskat

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site
LOCATION: Moosonee

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Fort Albany Site
LOCATION: Fort Albany

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Campbell Dr
Uxbridge site, Oak Valley Health
Uxbridge ON L9P 1R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058529771
Fax: 9058622006
Address: PO Box 664
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
Moose Factory ON P0L 1W0
Phone: 7058584544
Extension: 2237
Fax: 7056584917
Address: 4 Campbell Drive
(locum/ in transition)
Uxbridge Ontario L9P 1S4
Phone: (905) 852-9771
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 406 Lambert St
Whitehorse Medical Services Ltd
Whitehorse YT Y1A 1Z7
Phone: 8673936600
Fax: 8673936601

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Attawapiskat Site Attawapiskat
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site Moosonee
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Fort Albany Site Fort Albany
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Attawapiskat Site
LOCATION: Attawapiskat

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site
LOCATION: Moosonee

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Fort Albany Site
LOCATION: Fort Albany

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAHEL AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAHEL AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001