THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:27:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 8-211 Ferndale Drive South
Barrie Ontario L4N 6B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-792-4800
Fax: 705-792-4009

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Lalik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 8-211 Ferndale Drive South
Barrie Ontario L4N 6B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-792-4800
Fax: 705-792-4009

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Lalik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANDREW LALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANDREW LALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001