THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:32:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partnets
2200 Eglinton Avenue Weat
4th floor
Mississauga, ON. L5M 2N1
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-813-1100
Extension: 5130
Fax: 905-813-4024
Address: Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Center Site
150 Sherway Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: 416-521-4110
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bahl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Nov 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partnets
2200 Eglinton Avenue Weat
4th floor
Mississauga, ON. L5M 2N1
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-813-1100
Extension: 5130
Fax: 905-813-4024
Address: Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Center Site
150 Sherway Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: 416-521-4110
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bahl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Nov 2013

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALA BAHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALA BAHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001