THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:14:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 16 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jean-Mathieu Racicot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Oct 2012

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 16 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jean-Mathieu Racicot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Oct 2012

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 06 May 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2023
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 23 May 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2021
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 06 May 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 23 May 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001