THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:29:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 1
1146 Birchview Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5H 3C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 271-7500
Fax: (905) 271-6800

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 1
1146 Birchview Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5H 3C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 271-7500
Fax: (905) 271-6800

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTONELLA MORRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTONELLA MORRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Aug 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2001