THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:41:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5108 Barron Drive Northwest
Calgary Alberta T2L 1T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 403 461 7437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5108 Barron Drive Northwest
Calgary Alberta T2L 1T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 403 461 7437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TURKI RASHED T ALFUHAID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALFUHAID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TURKI RASHED T ALFUHAID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALFUHAID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2024
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2001