THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:11:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Mysore, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 233
10th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 1S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 371-1278
Fax: (519) 371-4718

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Jun 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA
Medical School: University of Mysore, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 233
10th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 1S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 371-1278
Fax: (519) 371-4718

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Jun 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Oct 2011
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 26 2011
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Yatish Nonavinakere Setty may practise medicine independently in
rheumatology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Yatish Nonavinakere Setty may practise medicine independently in
rheumatology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Mysore, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Nov 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2001