THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:57:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: Arnaout, Angel (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Arnaout Al Karain, Angel (Used Until: 05 Jun 2011) Arnaout, Angel (Used Until: 13 Jul 2005)
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, MANDARIN, TAIWANESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Hospital Research Institute
Cancer Therapeutics
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132196372
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Rose Ages Breast Health Centre
4th Floor (New Wing) Cancer Center
Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
501 Smyth Road, Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4400
Extension: 3
Fax: (613) 761-4994

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angel Arnaout Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Feb 2025

General Information

Former Name: Arnaout, Angel (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Arnaout Al Karain, Angel (Used Until: 05 Jun 2011) Arnaout, Angel (Used Until: 13 Jul 2005)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, MANDARIN, TAIWANESE
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Hospital Research Institute
Cancer Therapeutics
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132196372
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Rose Ages Breast Health Centre
4th Floor (New Wing) Cancer Center
Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
501 Smyth Road, Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4400
Extension: 3
Fax: (613) 761-4994

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angel Arnaout Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Feb 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGEL ARNAOUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARNAOUT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGEL ARNAOUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARNAOUT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2001