THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:26:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2009 to 30 Mar 2010
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
01 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
01 Jun 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
01 Jun 2006 to 30 May 2007
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2005 to 31 May 2006
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
01 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2004 to 30 Apr 2005
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2003 to 29 Feb 2004
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
16 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2002 to 15 Oct 2002
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Mar 2010
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jun 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jun 2006 to 30 May 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2005 to 31 May 2006
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Apr 2005
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Feb 2004
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 16 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2002 to 15 Oct 2002
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Mar 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2001
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2001