THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:21:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Benin, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact RSRS: 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON., M3J 1Y6, Website: http://www.rsrs.com Telephone: 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 28 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Idami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Jul 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Benin, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact RSRS: 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON., M3J 1Y6, Website: http://www.rsrs.com Telephone: 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 28 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Idami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Jul 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Benin, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 19 May 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 20 Sep 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2001
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 19 May 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2001