THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:45:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Coronation Dental Specialty Group
17B-350 CONESTOGA BLV
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 18886233810
Fax: 5196231760

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Coronation Dental Specialty Group
17B-350 CONESTOGA BLV
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 18886233810
Fax: 5196231760

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Nov 2009
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 12 2009
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ramez Samir Hanna Shehata may practise medicine independently in
Anaesthesia, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ramez Samir Hanna Shehata may practise medicine independently in
Anaesthesia, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2002