THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:31:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Osmania University, 1975
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TELUGU, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9500 Markham Road
Markham Ontario L6E 0N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 201-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Feb 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 05 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TELUGU, URDU
Medical School: Osmania University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9500 Markham Road
Markham Ontario L6E 0N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 201-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Feb 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 05 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISHNA VENI CHUNDURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNDURI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISHNA VENI CHUNDURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNDURI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Osmania University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Feb 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2002