THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:52:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: Umbalin, Shirley De La Cruz (Used Until: 13 Jul 2015)
Medical School: Far Eastern University, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ILOCANO, TAGALOG

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-245-2463
Fax: 705-245-0135

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shirley Babaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2024

General Information

Former Name: Umbalin, Shirley De La Cruz (Used Until: 13 Jul 2015)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ILOCANO, TAGALOG
Medical School: Far Eastern University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-245-2463
Fax: 705-245-0135

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shirley Babaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIRLEY DE LA CRUZ BABARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABARAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIRLEY DE LA CRUZ BABARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABARAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Far Eastern University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2002