THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:54:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 626-1223
Fax: (807) 623-8832

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Atwood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Atwood (CPSO#: 77456 )
Business Address: 201 - 1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 0A1
(807) 626-1223

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 626-1223
Fax: (807) 623-8832

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Atwood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Atwood (CPSO#: 77456 )
Business Address: 201 - 1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 0A1
(807) 626-1223

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ADRIANA ATWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATWOOD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ADRIANA ATWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATWOOD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002