THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:06:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road, Box 201A
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 73034
Fax: (613) 739-6102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Hematology
Effective: 26 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road, Box 201A
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 73034
Fax: (613) 739-6102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Hematology
Effective: 26 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC CARRIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARRIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC CARRIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARRIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002