THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:00:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 610 6th Floor
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-6500
Fax: (905) 895-0121

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 02 Oct 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 610 6th Floor
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-6500
Fax: (905) 895-0121

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 02 Oct 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA ELIZABETH FARIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA ELIZABETH FARIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002