THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:53:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-464 Welland Ave
St. Catharines ON L2M 5V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056826593
Fax: 2894344773
Address: GLENRIDGE WALK IN CLINIC
209 GLENRIDGE AVENUE
St. Catharines Ontario L2T3J6
Phone: 289 362 5333
Fax: 289 362 5335

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Monica Bertolo Medicine Professioinal Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-464 Welland Ave
St. Catharines ON L2M 5V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056826593
Fax: 2894344773
Address: GLENRIDGE WALK IN CLINIC
209 GLENRIDGE AVENUE
St. Catharines Ontario L2T3J6
Phone: 289 362 5333
Fax: 289 362 5335

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Monica Bertolo Medicine Professioinal Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA LINDA BERTOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTOLO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA LINDA BERTOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTOLO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002