THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:31:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1280 Main St W
McMaster University
Student Wellness Centre
PGCLL Level 2-210 Stearn Drive North
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055259140
Extension: 27700
Fax: 1-855-683-4077

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1280 Main St W
McMaster University
Student Wellness Centre
PGCLL Level 2-210 Stearn Drive North
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055259140
Extension: 27700
Fax: 1-855-683-4077

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FIONA EVA O'SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FIONA EVA O'SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2023
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2022
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002