THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:52:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Catharines General Hospital
Dept of Medicine - Critical Care
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056847271
Extension: 44501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 22 South Greene Street
University of Maryland
Shock Trauma Center
Baltimore Maryland United States 21201
Phone: 410-328-2630
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 601 Elmwood Ave
University of Rochester Medical Center
Rochester NY United States 14642-0002
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Hawaii
USA - New York
USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.G. Hollidge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Jun 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Catharines General Hospital
Dept of Medicine - Critical Care
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056847271
Extension: 44501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 22 South Greene Street
University of Maryland
Shock Trauma Center
Baltimore Maryland United States 21201
Phone: 410-328-2630
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 601 Elmwood Ave
University of Rochester Medical Center
Rochester NY United States 14642-0002
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Hawaii
USA - New York
USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.G. Hollidge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Jun 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE GAY HOLLIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLIDGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE GAY HOLLIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLIDGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002