THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:09:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Former patients who were seen out of my Oshawa or Brampton Clinics (New Direction Addiction Clinic) should contact the clinics current address listed below.

If you were seen at a clinic other than the one in Oshawa or Brampton, please email me at [email protected] to get further directions.

Oshawa Clinic
202 King Street East, Oshawa ON, L1H 1C4
Phone: 905-404-5464 or 905-579-4900
(the clinic is located inside the pharmacy)

Brampton Clinic
14 Lisa Street, Brampton ON, L6T 4W2
Phone: 905-460-1762
(clinic located inside of Pharmasave)
Date Received: 03 May 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rolan Koifman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jun 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Former patients who were seen out of my Oshawa or Brampton Clinics (New Direction Addiction Clinic) should contact the clinics current address listed below.

If you were seen at a clinic other than the one in Oshawa or Brampton, please email me at [email protected] to get further directions.

Oshawa Clinic
202 King Street East, Oshawa ON, L1H 1C4
Phone: 905-404-5464 or 905-579-4900
(the clinic is located inside the pharmacy)

Brampton Clinic
14 Lisa Street, Brampton ON, L6T 4W2
Phone: 905-460-1762
(clinic located inside of Pharmasave)
Date Received: 03 May 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rolan Koifman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jun 2022

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
12 Mar 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 12 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Effective March 12, 2024 , Dr. Koifman must temporarily cease to practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Effective March 12, 2024 , Dr. Koifman must temporarily cease to practice.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 14 Jul 2023
Summary:
Findings of Guilt

Rolan Koifman was found guilty of the following offences:

1.  1 count of Impaired Operation of a Motor Vehicle, contrary to s. 320.14(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date:  July 14, 2023
SENTENCE:  90 day Conditional Sentence Order (sentenced to 90 days imprisonment, to be served in the community subject to the sentence conditions below);
12 month driving prohibition;
3 year probation (conditions below);
Victim fine surcharge of $3,000

Conditional Sentence Conditions:
1.  Keep the peace and be of good behaviour.
2.  Appear before the court when required to do so by the court.
3.  Report as the Court directs in person to a supervisor and thereafter report when required by the supervisor and in a manner directed by the supervisor.
4.  Remain in Ontario unless you have prior written permission from the Court or the supervisor to leave the province.
5.  Notify the court or supervisor in advance of any change of name or address and promptly notify the court or supervisor of any change in employment or occupation.
6.  Report by phone to a supervisor by no later than 4:30 pm on July 18th, 2023 and after that, at all times and places as directed by the supervisor or any person authorized by a supervisor to assist in your supervision.
7.  This home confinement condition will be in effect for the full duration of the sentence.
8.  Remain in your residence or on the property of your residence at all times except:
     -  between 12pm and 4pm every Saturday in order to acquire the necessities of life
     -  for any medical emergencies involving you or any member of your immediate family (spouse, child, parent, sibling)
     -  for going directly to and from or being at employment
     -  for going directly to or from and being at any previously schedule assessment, treatment or counselling sessions or any previously scheduled medical or dental appointments
     - with the prior written approval of the supervisor.  The written approval is to be carried with you during these times.
     -  for going to, from, and while at the pharmacy to pick up your prescribed drugs.
9.  Attend and actively participate in all assessment, counselling or rehabilitative programs as directed by the supervisor and complete them to the satisfaction of the supervisor for including, but not limited to substance abuse.
10.Sign any release of information forms as will enable your supervisor to monitor your attendance and completion of any assessments, counselling or rehabilitative programs as directed.

 Probation Conditions:
1.  Keep the peace and be of good behaviour.
2.  Appear before the court when required to do so by the court.
3.  Notify the court or the probation officer in advance of any change of name or address and promptly notify the court or the probation officer of any change in employment or occupation.
4.  Report by phone to a probation officer within 2 working days of completion of your Conditional Sentence Order and after that, at all times and places as directed by the probation officer or any person authorized by a probation officer to assist in your supervision.
5.  Your reporting requirement ends when you have satisfied your probation officer that you have completed all of your counselling.
6.  Attend and actively participate in all assessment, counselling or rehabilitative programs as directed by the probation officer and complete them to the satisfaction of the probation officer for including, but not limited to substance abuse.
7.  Sign any release of information forms as will enable your probation officer to monitor your attendance and completion of any assessments, counselling or rehabilitative programs as directed.
8.  For the first 12 months of this Probation Order, you are not to operate any motor vehicle.
9.  As of July 15, 2024, you are not to operate any motor vehicle unless going to, from and during the course of your employment with no non-medically prescribed drugs in your system.  

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 14 Jul 2023
Summary:
Findings of Guilt

Rolan Koifman was found guilty of the following offences:

1.  1 count of Impaired Operation of a Motor Vehicle, contrary to s. 320.14(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date:  July 14, 2023
SENTENCE:  90 day Conditional Sentence Order (sentenced to 90 days imprisonment, to be served in the community subject to the sentence conditions below);
12 month driving prohibition;
3 year probation (conditions below);
Victim fine surcharge of $3,000

Conditional Sentence Conditions:
1.  Keep the peace and be of good behaviour.
2.  Appear before the court when required to do so by the court.
3.  Report as the Court directs in person to a supervisor and thereafter report when required by the supervisor and in a manner directed by the supervisor.
4.  Remain in Ontario unless you have prior written permission from the Court or the supervisor to leave the province.
5.  Notify the court or supervisor in advance of any change of name or address and promptly notify the court or supervisor of any change in employment or occupation.
6.  Report by phone to a supervisor by no later than 4:30 pm on July 18th, 2023 and after that, at all times and places as directed by the supervisor or any person authorized by a supervisor to assist in your supervision.
7.  This home confinement condition will be in effect for the full duration of the sentence.
8.  Remain in your residence or on the property of your residence at all times except:
     -  between 12pm and 4pm every Saturday in order to acquire the necessities of life
     -  for any medical emergencies involving you or any member of your immediate family (spouse, child, parent, sibling)
     -  for going directly to and from or being at employment
     -  for going directly to or from and being at any previously schedule assessment, treatment or counselling sessions or any previously scheduled medical or dental appointments
     - with the prior written approval of the supervisor.  The written approval is to be carried with you during these times.
     -  for going to, from, and while at the pharmacy to pick up your prescribed drugs.
9.  Attend and actively participate in all assessment, counselling or rehabilitative programs as directed by the supervisor and complete them to the satisfaction of the supervisor for including, but not limited to substance abuse.
10.Sign any release of information forms as will enable your supervisor to monitor your attendance and completion of any assessments, counselling or rehabilitative programs as directed.

 Probation Conditions:
1.  Keep the peace and be of good behaviour.
2.  Appear before the court when required to do so by the court.
3.  Notify the court or the probation officer in advance of any change of name or address and promptly notify the court or the probation officer of any change in employment or occupation.
4.  Report by phone to a probation officer within 2 working days of completion of your Conditional Sentence Order and after that, at all times and places as directed by the probation officer or any person authorized by a probation officer to assist in your supervision.
5.  Your reporting requirement ends when you have satisfied your probation officer that you have completed all of your counselling.
6.  Attend and actively participate in all assessment, counselling or rehabilitative programs as directed by the probation officer and complete them to the satisfaction of the probation officer for including, but not limited to substance abuse.
7.  Sign any release of information forms as will enable your probation officer to monitor your attendance and completion of any assessments, counselling or rehabilitative programs as directed.
8.  For the first 12 months of this Probation Order, you are not to operate any motor vehicle.
9.  As of July 15, 2024, you are not to operate any motor vehicle unless going to, from and during the course of your employment with no non-medically prescribed drugs in your system.  

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002