THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:26:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: Farkas, Gabrielle Tsipora (Used Until: 20 Jul 2004)
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-5927 Bathurst St
North York ON M2R 3T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6475577571
Fax: 416-243-5730

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Farkas, Gabrielle Tsipora (Used Until: 20 Jul 2004)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-5927 Bathurst St
North York ON M2R 3T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6475577571
Fax: 416-243-5730

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIELLE TSIPORA SINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIELLE TSIPORA SINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002