THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:29:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: H-422 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga ON L5B 0M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6472556655
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 59 Dundas St E
Telemed Belleville
Belleville ON K8N 1B7
Phone: 18883502323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Aug 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 11 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. WARDA FAROOQ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Dec 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, URDU
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: H-422 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga ON L5B 0M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6472556655
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 59 Dundas St E
Telemed Belleville
Belleville ON K8N 1B7
Phone: 18883502323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Aug 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 11 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. WARDA FAROOQ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Dec 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WARDA UMAR FAROOQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAROOQ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WARDA UMAR FAROOQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAROOQ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002