THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 19:06:10 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Peter Munk Cardiac Centre, Toronto General Hospital, 585 University Avenue, Toronto, M5G 2N2.
Date Received: 24 Aug 2020

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Peter Munk Cardiac Centre, Toronto General Hospital, 585 University Avenue, Toronto, M5G 2N2.
Date Received: 24 Aug 2020

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 24 Aug 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2002
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2002