THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:23:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bridgepoint Health
Outpatient Clinic
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-461-8252
Extension: 2933
Fax: 416-461-2089

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Audrey Yap Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yap (CPSO#: 77754 )
Business Address: 1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto Ontario M4M 1B5
(416) 461-8252 Extn: 2933

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bridgepoint Health
Outpatient Clinic
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-461-8252
Extension: 2933
Fax: 416-461-2089

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Audrey Yap Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yap (CPSO#: 77754 )
Business Address: 1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto Ontario M4M 1B5
(416) 461-8252 Extn: 2933

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AUDREY POH GECK YAP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AUDREY POH GECK YAP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002