THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:52:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 211 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Dept of Medicine
Markham ON L3P 2M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168368695
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Kuwait

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adel Al Sarraf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jun 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 211 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Dept of Medicine
Markham ON L3P 2M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168368695
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Kuwait

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adel Al Sarraf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jun 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEL ABDULRASOUL HASAN MOHAMMAD AL SARRAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL SARRAF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEL ABDULRASOUL HASAN MOHAMMAD AL SARRAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL SARRAF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2002