THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 19:31:44 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kelowna General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2268 Pandosy Streeet
Kelowna British Columbia V1Y 1T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2509801760
Fax: No Information Available
Address: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Emergency Department
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Phone: (705) 645-4404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 07 Feb 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 07 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kelowna General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2268 Pandosy Streeet
Kelowna British Columbia V1Y 1T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2509801760
Fax: No Information Available
Address: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Emergency Department
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Phone: (705) 645-4404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 07 Feb 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 07 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW DOUGLAS PETRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW DOUGLAS PETRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002