THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:24:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Karnatak Institute of Medical Science, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Jarvis Street Clinic
118 Jarvis Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 2S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 320 9922
Fax: (289) 320 9920
Address: 6080 McLeod Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 7T4
Phone: 12892488800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sridhar Nilam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Nov 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Karnatak Institute of Medical Science, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Jarvis Street Clinic
118 Jarvis Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 2S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 320 9922
Fax: (289) 320 9920
Address: 6080 McLeod Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 7T4
Phone: 12892488800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sridhar Nilam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Nov 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SRIDHAR NILAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NILAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SRIDHAR NILAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NILAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Karnatak Institute of Medical Science, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2002