THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:14:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave. West
Mississauga, ON L5M 2N1
Date Received: 03 Sep 2020

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lindsay Teskey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jun 2021

Corporation Name: Teskey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave. West
Mississauga, ON L5M 2N1
Date Received: 03 Sep 2020

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lindsay Teskey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jun 2021

Corporation Name: Teskey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002