THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:54:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 WILSON AVE
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mahan Javanmard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 WILSON AVE
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mahan Javanmard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHAN JAVANMARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAVANMARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHAN JAVANMARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAVANMARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002