THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:32:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168297872
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Florence Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168297872
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Florence Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FLORENCE ANNE KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FLORENCE ANNE KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002