THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:38:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: Henen, Mireille Ghattas (Used Until: 27 Jun 2004)
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dixie Road Medical Associates
2200 Dixie Road
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 279-1700
Fax: (905) 897-9167
Address: 3420 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A9
Phone: (905) 272-0165
Fax: (905) 272-0162

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.Mireille G.Attalla medicine.Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Sep 2022

Corporation Name: Dr. Mireille G. Attalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: Henen, Mireille Ghattas (Used Until: 27 Jun 2004)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dixie Road Medical Associates
2200 Dixie Road
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 279-1700
Fax: (905) 897-9167
Address: 3420 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A9
Phone: (905) 272-0165
Fax: (905) 272-0162

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.Mireille G.Attalla medicine.Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Sep 2022

Corporation Name: Dr. Mireille G. Attalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIREILLE GHATTAS ATTALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATTALLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIREILLE GHATTAS ATTALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATTALLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002