THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 19:57:33 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6435
Fax: (416) 469-7998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6435
Fax: (416) 469-7998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINGLI MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINGLI MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002