THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:58:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Ave
met campus, Windsor regional hospital
emergency department
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Ouellette Campus, Windsor regional hospital
emergency department
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Ave
met campus, Windsor regional hospital
emergency department
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Ouellette Campus, Windsor regional hospital
emergency department
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULLAH SAID HUMAID AL RISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL RISI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULLAH SAID HUMAID AL RISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL RISI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2023
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002