THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:00:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1998
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Urogynaecology
01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
Clinical Fellow - Urogynaecology
01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 May 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Urogynaecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Urogynaecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 May 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002