THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:37:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Minnesota, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1333 Sheppard Ave. E.
#328
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 494-7900
Fax: (416) 494-9179

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Minnesota, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1333 Sheppard Ave. E.
#328
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 494-7900
Fax: (416) 494-9179

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL HAJEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL HAJEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Minnesota, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2002