THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:45:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: United Arab Emirates University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Apr 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 14 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: United Arab Emirates University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Apr 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 14 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: United Arab Emirates University, 1998
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
07 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2003 to 06 Aug 2003
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 07 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2003 to 06 Aug 2003
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2002
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2002