THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:06:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Sylvan Street
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
Emergency Department
Kenora Ontario P0V
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168592035
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Sylvan Street
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
Emergency Department
Kenora Ontario P0V
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168592035
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VALERIE FAY KRYM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRYM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VALERIE FAY KRYM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRYM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2002