THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:16:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: MCI
5230 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke
Toronto Ontario M9B 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 234 8668
Fax: 416 234 8720
Address: 100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-80 Micro Court
Markham Ontario L3R 9Z5
Phone: 647 499 2899
Fax: 416 479 3948

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Fayez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Aug 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: MCI
5230 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke
Toronto Ontario M9B 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 234 8668
Fax: 416 234 8720
Address: 100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-80 Micro Court
Markham Ontario L3R 9Z5
Phone: 647 499 2899
Fax: 416 479 3948

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Fayez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Aug 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IBRAHIM HALIM IBRAHIM FAYEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAYEZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IBRAHIM HALIM IBRAHIM FAYEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAYEZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2002