THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:21:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stirling Medical Centre
R R 4
9C Tuftsville Road
Stirling Ontario K0K 3E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 395-5566
Fax: (613) 395-3636

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE, TAMIL
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stirling Medical Centre
R R 4
9C Tuftsville Road
Stirling Ontario K0K 3E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 395-5566
Fax: (613) 395-3636

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KOSHELA RANJITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANJITH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KOSHELA RANJITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANJITH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 28 Aug 2007
Summary of Decision:
On December 3, 2007, the Discipline Committee ordered the following:

(1) The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Ranjith(s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month, which suspension in its entirety if Dr. Ranjith successfully completes, at her own expense, the College(s Medical Ethics and Informed Consent course and the follow-up portion of the College(s Medical Record-Keeping for Physicians course within six (6) months from the date reasons are released in respect of this Order, and provides proof thereof to the College.

(2) The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Ranjith to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

(3) The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Ranjith to pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500 within 60 days of the date of this order

(4) The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 28, 2007

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 28 Aug 2007
Summary of Decision:
On December 3, 2007, the Discipline Committee ordered the following:

(1) The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Ranjith(s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month, which suspension in its entirety if Dr. Ranjith successfully completes, at her own expense, the College(s Medical Ethics and Informed Consent course and the follow-up portion of the College(s Medical Record-Keeping for Physicians course within six (6) months from the date reasons are released in respect of this Order, and provides proof thereof to the College.

(2) The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Ranjith to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

(3) The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Ranjith to pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500 within 60 days of the date of this order

(4) The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 28, 2007

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2002