THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:10:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Medical Centre
55 Argyle Street North
Caledonia Ontario N3W 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 765-4061
Fax: (905) 765-0584

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Medical Centre
55 Argyle Street North
Caledonia Ontario N3W 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 765-4061
Fax: (905) 765-0584

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLAAS GERT FRANCOIS CLOETE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLOETE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLAAS GERT FRANCOIS CLOETE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLOETE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 21 Nov 2024
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.


The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 18 Jun 2020
Summary:
Effective December 10, 2020, Dr Nicolaas Cloete has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP: 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 21 Nov 2024
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.


The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 18 Jun 2020
Summary:
Effective December 10, 2020, Dr Nicolaas Cloete has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP: 

Training

Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee. Effective: 09 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee. Effective: 26 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2002