THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:29:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 88 Maplewood Ave
St Peter's Hospital - HHS
Hamilton ON L8M 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 549-6525
Extension: 12360
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 347 Colborne St
Brantford ON N3S 3N2
Phone: 5197539581
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Centre for Healthy Aging
Hamilton Health Sciences
St. Peter's Hospital Site
88 Maplewood Ave
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
Phone: (905) 549-6525
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Health Care Hamilton
West 5th Campus
Geriatrics Room H101
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 36782
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 525 Belmont Ave W
Belgage Medical Arts Building
206A
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
Phone: 5199542201
Fax: 5199542202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 88 Maplewood Ave
St Peter's Hospital - HHS
Hamilton ON L8M 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 549-6525
Extension: 12360
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 347 Colborne St
Brantford ON N3S 3N2
Phone: 5197539581
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Centre for Healthy Aging
Hamilton Health Sciences
St. Peter's Hospital Site
88 Maplewood Ave
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
Phone: (905) 549-6525
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Health Care Hamilton
West 5th Campus
Geriatrics Room H101
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 36782
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 525 Belmont Ave W
Belgage Medical Arts Building
206A
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
Phone: 5199542201
Fax: 5199542202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANA HATEGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HATEGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANA HATEGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HATEGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2002