THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:48:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 120
8120 Cook Road
Richmond British Columbia V6Y 1T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 278-5191
Fax: (604) 278-5197

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CHINESE
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 120
8120 Cook Road
Richmond British Columbia V6Y 1T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 278-5191
Fax: (604) 278-5197

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XIN-YONG WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XIN-YONG WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2002