THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:45:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Chittagong, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: (905) 472-7004

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: University of Chittagong, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: (905) 472-7004

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHIDA SULTANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULTANA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHIDA SULTANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULTANA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Chittagong, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2003