THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sri Venkatesvara University, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TAMIL, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Pandit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jul 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TAMIL, TELUGU
Medical School: Sri Venkatesvara University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Pandit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jul 2020

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sri Venkatesvara University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 May 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Jan 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2002
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 May 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2006

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 2002