THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 16:51:40 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Khartoum, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 252-9861
Extension: 4
Fax: 5192527787

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abdelaziz Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Khartoum, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 252-9861
Extension: 4
Fax: 5192527787

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abdelaziz Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDELAZIZ ALAM ELHUDA AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDELAZIZ ALAM ELHUDA AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Khartoum, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2003
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 May 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2007

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2003