THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 07:10:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cornell University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jai Jayaraman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Mar 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Cornell University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jai Jayaraman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Mar 2019

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
07 May 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 07 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Effective February 25, 2025, Dr. Jai Jayaraman must temporarily cease to practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Effective February 25, 2025, Dr. Jai Jayaraman must temporarily cease to practice.

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Referral or Application: 04 Dec 2024

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (4)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 04 Dec 2024
Summary:

Re: CAS-XXXXXX-XXX4K9
 
Caution-in-Person: 

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:   



Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 04 Dec 2024
Summary:

Re: CAS-XXXXXX-XXX9Q7
 
Caution-in-Person: 

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:   



Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Jan 2023
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 14 Mar 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Referral or Application: 04 Dec 2024

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (4)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 04 Dec 2024
Summary:

Re: CAS-XXXXXX-XXX4K9
 
Caution-in-Person: 

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:   



Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 04 Dec 2024
Summary:

Re: CAS-XXXXXX-XXX9Q7
 
Caution-in-Person: 

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:   



Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Jan 2023
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 14 Mar 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Training

Medical School: Cornell University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 25 Feb 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 21 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 01 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 24 Mar 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 01 May 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2003